IL HB4626 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts concerning children by: replacing certain pronouns with the nouns to which the pronouns refer; replacing certain instances of the word "biological"; changing the Independent Juvenile Ombudsman to the Independent Juvenile Ombudsperson; deleting certain obsolete language; and making technical and other changes. Effective 60 days after becoming law.
Title
CHILDREN-PRONOUNS-REFERENCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-042-000 |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |