IL HB4625 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for employers, employment agencies, and labor organizations to take certain employment-related actions on the basis of an individual's weight and size. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for any person, being the owner, lessee, proprietor, manager, superintendent, agent, or employee of any place of public accommodation, because of the weight and size of any person, directly or indirectly, to refuse, withhold from, or deny to any individual any of the accommodations, advantages, facilities, or privileges thereof.
Title
EMPLOYMENT&ACCOMODATION-WEIGHT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 5-102.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4625&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4625.htm |