IL HB4618 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Requires candidates filing for Supreme Court Judge, appellate court judge, circuit court judge, or judicial retention to file his or her statement of economic interests in written or printed form. Repeals a provision that established a separate form for persons required to file a statement of economic interests with county clerks. Defines terms. Adds applicability clause. Makes conforming changes.
Title
ETHICS-UNIFORM ECON DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 1-102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-112.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4618&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4618.htm |