IL HB4607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a grandparent may not be criminally or civilly liable for a violation of the Kidnaping and Related Offenses Article of the Code when the grandparent transports a child to another state for medical care or treatment if the grandparent reasonably believes that: (1) the child needs emergency medical care or treatment because of injury or illness; (2) a medical provider is not located within a short distance from the child's residence in this State; and (3) failure to transport the child to another state will risk further illness or injury to the child. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services may not place a child described in this provision in its custody or foster care on the basis that the child is transported to another state under circumstances described in this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-CHILD-ANOTHER STATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720510-11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback