IL HB4605 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a violation for an owner or any other person engaging in a real estate transaction, or for a real estate broker or salesman to otherwise make unavailable or deny a dwelling because of unlawful discrimination, familial status, or an arrest record. Allows a plaintiff or defendant to demand a trial by jury for specified civil actions. Allows a circuit court or jury to award any remedy set forth under a provision regarding a hearing on a complaint upon the finding of a civil rights violation. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-JURY TRIALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0706 |
2022-04-22 | House | Effective Date April 22, 2022 |
2022-04-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Human Rights; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-009-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 10-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 3-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 8-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |