IL HB4604 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for student-assistance contributions sunsets on December 31, 2030 (currently, December 30, 2020). Provides that, for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2020, the maximum student-assistance credit is $1,000 per contributing employee per taxable year (currently, $500). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STUDENT ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4604&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4604.htm |