IL HB4599 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who is not eligible to participate in a downstate firefighter pension fund and is employed on a full-time basis by a participating municipality to perform duties as a paramedic, emergency medical technician (EMT), emergency medical technician-intermediate (EMT-I), or advanced emergency medical technician (A-EMT) may be granted Sheriff's Law Enforcement Employee (SLEP) status with the approval of the employing municipality. The approval resolution must specify that SLEP status shall be applied to employment occurring on or after the adoption of the resolution. Provides that the resolution is irrevocable. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-PARAMEDIC-EMT SLEP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Remains in Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-004-001 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-109.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4599&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4599.htm |