IL HB4598 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Modifies the definition of "fire fighter" in the Act to include paramedics employed by a unit of local government. Amends the Public Employee Disability Act. Provides that the term "eligible employee" as used in the Act includes firefighters employed as paramedics or who perform paramedic duties.
Title
EMPLOYEE-FIREFIGHTER PARAMEDIC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 345 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |