IL HB4595 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0778
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a contract between a pharmacy benefit manager or third-party payer and a 340B entity or 340B pharmacy shall not contain specified provisions. Provides that a violation by a pharmacy benefit manager constitutes an unfair or deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance, and that a provision that violates the prohibition on certain provisions in a contract between a pharmacy benefit manager or a third-party payer and a 340B entity that is entered into, amended, or renewed after July 1, 2022 shall be void and unenforceable. In provisions concerning pharmacy benefit managers, provides that the provisions apply to contracts entered into or renewed on or after July 1, 2022 (rather than July 1, 2020). Defines terms. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning pharmacy benefits, provides that a Medicaid managed care organization or pharmacy benefit manager administering or managing benefits on behalf of a Medicaid managed organization shall not include specified provisions in a contract with a 340B entity or 340B pharmacy. Provides that a provision that violates the prohibition on certain provisions in a contract between a Medicaid managed care organization or its pharmacy benefit manager and a 340B entity entered into, amended, or renewed after July 1, 2022 shall be void and unenforceable. Effective July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-DRUG DISCOUNT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0778
2022-05-13HouseEffective Date July 1, 2022
2022-05-13HouseGovernor Approved
2022-04-28HouseSent to the Governor
2022-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2022-03-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2022-03-30HousePassed Both Houses
2022-03-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2022-03-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2022-03-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2022-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022
2022-03-23SenateSecond Reading
2022-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2022-03-23SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
2022-03-16SenateAssigned to Insurance
2022-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2022-03-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2022-03-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2022-03-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2022-03-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2022-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2022-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2022-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022
2022-03-04SenateArrive in Senate
2022-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2022-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2022-03-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001
2022-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2022-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2022-03-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 015-000-000
2022-03-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2022-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2022-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2022-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2022-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2022-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2022-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2022-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 018-000-000
2022-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2022-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2022-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2022-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2022-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2022-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2022-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2022-02-09HouseAssigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2022-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2022-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2022-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2022-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2022-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2022-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2022-01-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2022-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2022-01-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2022-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2022-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2022-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2022-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2022-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2022-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2022-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2022-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2022-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2022-01-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-01-21HouseFirst Reading
2022-01-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2022-01-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2022-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155424Amended CodeCitation Text
2155513b1Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-36Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback