IL HB4594 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that effective for dates of service on or after January 1, 2023, the psychiatric standardized amount for psychiatric ambulatory services, categories of service 27 and 28, shall be no less than $402.92. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-PSYCHIATRIC AMBULATORY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-01-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-01-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 14-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4594&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4594.htm |