IL HB4589 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Savings Bank Act. Provides that a savings bank shall have its books, records, and accounts examined at least once every 18 months (rather than at least once in each year) in the same manner as a State Bank (rather than be audited by an independent licensed public accountant not connected with the savings bank). Removes requirements concerning an annual audit. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAVINGS BANK-EXAMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-020-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2052059004Repealed CodeCitation Text
2052059014Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback