IL HB4586 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-21)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department on Aging Adult Protective Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department on Aging Adult Protective Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CODE-AGG BAT-EMPLOYEES

Sponsors

Rep. Tony McCombie [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Tom Demmer [R]Rep. Robert Pritchard [R]
Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]Rep. Thomas Bennett [R]
Rep. David McSweeney [R]Rep. David Welter [R]Rep. Terri Bryant [R]Rep. Michael Unes [R]
Rep. Avery Bourne [R]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R]
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]
Rep. Mark Batinick [R]Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R]Rep. Jerry Long [R]Rep. Keith Sommer [R]
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R]Rep. Keith Wheeler [R]Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. Peter Breen [R]
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Reginald Phillips [R]Rep. James Durkin [R]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. Steven Andersson [R]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Laura Fine [D]Rep. Grant Wehrli [R]
Rep. Charles Meier [R]Rep. Christine Winger [R]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R]
Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D]Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R]Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R]
Rep. Dan Brady [R]Rep. Timothy Butler [R]Rep. Randy Frese [R]Rep. Thomas Morrison [R]
Rep. Ryan Spain [R]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Robert Martwick [D]
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. John Cabello [R]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]Rep. John Cavaletto [R]
Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. David Olsen [R]Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]
Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. David Reis [R]Rep. David Harris [R]Rep. Chad Hays [R]
Rep. Natalie Manley [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseRemains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-006-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback