IL HB4583 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that certain notice provisions that currently apply to regular meetings of a public body shall also apply to special meetings of a public body. Requires a public body that has a website maintained by a full-time staff to post the agenda and notice of meetings for both the governing body and all subsidiary bodies of the public body. Removes a provision stating that the failure of a public body to post on its website notice of any meeting or the agenda of any meeting shall not invalidate any meeting or any actions taken at a meeting. Requires a public body that has a website to post the minutes of a regular, special, or emergency meeting of its governing body (currently, only regular meeting). Allows a court to declare null and void any final action taken at a meeting in violation of the Act, regardless of whether or not the meeting was a closed meeting. Provides that a court shall (rather than may) assess against any party, except a State's Attorney, reasonable attorney's fees and other litigation costs reasonably incurred by any other party who substantially prevails in any action brought under specified provisions of the Act.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-SPECIAL MEETINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-001 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-001-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 120 | 2.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |