IL HB4583 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that certain notice provisions that currently apply to regular meetings of a public body shall also apply to special meetings of a public body. Requires a public body that has a website maintained by a full-time staff to post the agenda and notice of meetings for both the governing body and all subsidiary bodies of the public body. Removes a provision stating that the failure of a public body to post on its website notice of any meeting or the agenda of any meeting shall not invalidate any meeting or any actions taken at a meeting. Requires a public body that has a website to post the minutes of a regular, special, or emergency meeting of its governing body (currently, only regular meeting). Allows a court to declare null and void any final action taken at a meeting in violation of the Act, regardless of whether or not the meeting was a closed meeting. Provides that a court shall (rather than may) assess against any party, except a State's Attorney, reasonable attorney's fees and other litigation costs reasonably incurred by any other party who substantially prevails in any action brought under specified provisions of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPEN MEETINGS-SPECIAL MEETINGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-001
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-001-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51202.02Amended CodeCitation Text
51202.06Amended CodeCitation Text
51203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback