IL HB4581 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission in its annual submission of recommendation to the Governor and General Assembly shall include recommendations regarding the inclusion of emerging adults into a developmentally appropriate justice system, reducing recidivism, and preventing deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides in the Article concerning delinquent minors that on and after January 1, 2019, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 19th birthday has committed a misdemeanor offense and has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law, or county or municipal ordinance. Provides that on and after January 1, 2021, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 21st birthday has committed a misdemeanor offense and has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law or county or municipal ordinance. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to violations or attempted violations committed on or after the effective of the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV COURT-DELINQUENT MINOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050517a-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback