IL HB4578 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Solicitation for Charity Act. Provides that a trustee, person, or organization who failed to timely file an annual report shall pay a $50 (rather than $100) late filing fee. Effective immediately.
Title
CHARITABLE ORG-LATE FILING FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0753 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-02-28 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 460 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |