IL HB4576 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0812
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of Combat Action Ribbon or Combat Action Badge license plates. Provides that the Secretary of State may allow either plate to be issued as a vanity plate or personalized plate. Provides that neither plate is required to designate "Land of Lincoln" on the plate. Provides that the Secretary shall approve and prescribe stickers or decals. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-COMBAT ACTION PLATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0812
2018-08-13HouseEffective Date August 13, 2018
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.19New CodeSee Bill Text
62553-699.20New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback