IL HB4575 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that purchasing agencies shall promote the purchase of and give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in Illinois (currently, the United States). Provides that, if the purchasing agency determines that certain conditions apply to a procured product, then, with respect to that procurement, the purchasing agency shall give preference to manufactured articles, materials, and supplies that have been manufactured in the United States. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-002-000
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051710Amended CodeCitation Text
3051725Amended CodeCitation Text
305175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback