IL HB4572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that "employer" includes any person employing one (instead of 15) or more employees within Illinois during 20 or more calendar weeks within the calendar year of or preceding the alleged violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUM RIGHTS-EMPLOYER-DEFINITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-013-000
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-003-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 064-037-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-006-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-19HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2018-04-12HousePension Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-04-12HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2018-04-11HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77552-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback