IL HB4569 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to apply to any health care employer that (1) hires an employee under the Health Care Worker Background Check Act and the employee has submitted to a fingerprint-based criminal history records check, (2) uses and stores biometric information or biometric identifiers exclusively for employment, human resources, compliance, payroll, identification, authentication, safety, security, or fraud prevention purposes, (3) does not sell, lease, or trade the biometric information or biometric identifiers collected, and (4) maintains and follows a documented process to delete any biometric information or biometric identifier.
Title
BIOMETRIC INFO-HEALTH EMPLOYER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4569&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4569.htm |