IL HB4568 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Coal Mining Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Miners' Examining Board. Provides that the Mining Board shall carry out the duties of the Miners' Examining Board. Makes changes in provisions concerning rulemaking. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COAL MINING ACT-MINING BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0937 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-04 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-05 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 705 | 2.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 2.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 2.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 2.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 3.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.03 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 8.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | Art. 8 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |