IL HB4568 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the procurement compliance monitors and each chief procurement officer may access and review records necessary to determine whether a contract, purchase, or other expenditure is or is not subject to the provisions of the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-CPO RECORD ACCESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0771 |
2012-07-10 | House | Effective Date July 10, 2012 |
2012-07-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 106-012-000 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2012-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Trotter |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-000-004 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2012-03-22 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2012-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-03-21 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2012-03-14 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2012-03-14 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2012-03-14 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2012-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-03-09 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2012-03-09 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-08 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2012-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 10-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |