IL HB4563 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Motion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that contributions to a school district foundation are also qualified contributions under the Act. Provides that taxpayers who make contributions to a school district foundation are also eligible for a property tax credit. Provides that the term "contribution" means a donation made by the taxpayer during the taxable year for providing scholarships or support (currently, scholarships only). Contains provisions concerning the calculation of the credit or abatement for contributions to school district foundations and the aggregate amount of the credit and abatement available for those contributions. Amends the School Code. Provides that payments under the evidence-based funding formula shall be reduced by the amount of qualified contributions received by the applicable school district foundation under the Invest in Kids Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVEST KIDS-SCHOLARSHIP ORGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-01HouseTo Scholarship Tax Credit Oversight Subcommittee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105518-8.15Amended CodeCitation Text
354010Amended CodeCitation Text
354015Amended CodeCitation Text
354025Amended CodeCitation Text
354030Amended CodeCitation Text
354035Amended CodeCitation Text
35405Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback