IL HB4562 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Removes from the scope of the Act employing units with fewer than 2 employees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMP INS COVER ONLY 2 0R MORE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseTo Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820405204Amended CodeCitation Text
820405205Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback