IL HB4562 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Removes from the scope of the Act employing units with fewer than 2 employees. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMP INS COVER ONLY 2 0R MORE
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | To Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4562&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4562.htm |