IL HB4562 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Increases the amount of civil penalties for civil rights violations relating to real estate transactions as follows: (i) a maximum of $16,000 (instead of $10,000) if the respondent has not been adjudged to have committed any prior civil rights violation concerning real estate transactions; (ii) a maximum of $42,500 (instead of $25,000) if the respondent has been adjudged to have committed one other civil rights violation concerning real estate transactions during the 5-year period ending on the date of the filing of the current charge; and (iii) a maximum of $70,000 (instead of $50,000) if the respondent has been adjudged to have committed 2 or more civil rights violations concerning real estate transactions during the 7-year period ending on the date of the filing of the current charge.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS ACT-PENALTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0548 |
2016-07-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 8B-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |