IL HB4560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on August 11, 1999 by the City of Monmouth. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-CITY OF MONMOUTH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-29HouseHouse Concurs
2018-11-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-006-000
2018-11-29House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000
2018-11-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-11-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-11-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-11-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-11-15HouseArrived in House
2018-11-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-11-15Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
2018-11-15SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-11-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2018-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2018
2018-11-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2018
2018-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-10-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-010-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback