IL HB4560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on August 11, 1999 by the City of Monmouth. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-CITY OF MONMOUTH
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1167 |
2019-01-04 | House | Effective Date January 4, 2019 |
2019-01-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-12-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-29 | House | House Concurs |
2018-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-006-000 |
2018-11-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-11-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-11-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-11-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-11-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-11-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2018 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2018 |
2018-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-010-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |