IL HB4554 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that it is an aggravating factor in sentencing that the defendant committed the offense of driving while under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds or any combination thereof in violation of the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance and the defendant during the commission of the offense was driving his or her vehicle upon a roadway designated for one-way traffic in the opposite direction of the direction indicated by official traffic control devices.
Title
CD CORR-AGGRAVATING FACTOR-DUI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1053 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 107-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Criminal Law |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-003-005 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-001-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |