IL HB4552 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Enhances the penalties from assault and battery to aggravated assault and aggravated battery if the victim is a pharmacist, student pharmacist, or pharmacy technician performing his or her duties as a pharmacist, student pharmacist, or pharmacy technician. Enhances from a Class 2 felony to a Class 1 felony a robbery or burglary committed in a pharmacy. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that any person who violates the provisions concerning the illegal delivery of a controlled substance in an amount not otherwise specified in the statute classified in Schedule II, III, IV, or V that was illegally and directly obtained from a pharmacy, either through robbery or burglary, which substance is not included as a Class 2 felony by the statute, is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Provides that the fine for a violation shall not be more than $200,000. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
ENHANCED PENALTIES-PHARMACIST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 18-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 19-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4552&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4552.htm |