IL HB4550 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Second Chance State Act. Creates the Department of Returning Resident Affairs Act and amends the Freedom of Information Act, the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Contains declarations and findings. Sets forth the powers of the Department of Returning Resident Affairs in relation to returning residents (residents who have been detained, are defendants in criminal prosecutions, are incarcerated, or have been incarcerated) and other matters. Provides that the Department shall develop and administer the Second Chance State Program for returning residents and provides for the establishment of hub sites to provide specified services to eligible individuals and other elements of the Program. Creates the Second Chance State Transportation Task Force to create a program to provide no-cost or low-cost transportation options for returning residents before or after their release from incarceration. Creates the Returning Residents Interagency Council to identify the manner in which State officials and agencies can designate, allocate, and coordinate the use of their resources to best support the needs of returning residents. Provides for the appointment of a Director of Returning Resident Affairs who has experience working with or for a community-based organization and was incarcerated in an Illinois Department of Corrections facility for not less than one year, as well as an Assistant Director and a General Counsel. Provides that the Director, Assistant Director, and General Counsel shall serve for 7-year terms and are subject to removal only upon a finding of misconduct by the Executive Inspector General for the agencies of the Illinois Governor. Contains provisions regarding other matters. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT RETURNING RESIDENT AFFAIRS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-240 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4550&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4550.htm |