IL HB4543 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for State Fiscal Years 2021 through 2024, an annual assessment on inpatient and outpatient services is imposed on each hospital provider, subject to other specified provisions. Contains provisions concerning a hospital's non-Medicaid gross revenue for State Fiscal Years 2021 and 2022. Contains provisions concerning the assignment of a pool allocation percentage for certain hospitals designated as a Level II trauma center; increased capitation payments to managed care organizations; the extension of certain assessments to July 1, 2022 (rather than July 1, 2020); reimbursements for inpatient general acute care services to non-publicly owned safety net hospitals, non-publicly owned critical access hospitals, hospital providers in high-need communities, and other facilities; the allocation of funds from the transitional access hospital pool; administrative rules for data collection and payment from the health disparities pay-for-collection pool; and other matters. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall have emergency rulemaking authority to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act concerning assessments. Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Removes provisions requiring the Department of Public Health to issue a Freestanding Emergency Center license to a facility that has discontinued inpatient hospital services and meets other requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-RATES-ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 32.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 14-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4543&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4543.htm |