IL HB4543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission shall include recommendations regarding the availability of youth services to reduce the use of detention and prevent deeper criminal involvement in its annual submission of a report to the Governor and General Assembly. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that on and after July 1, 2019, a minor who is 13 years of age or older (rather than 10 years of age or older) may be detained in an authorized detention facility under certain circumstances. Provides that it is the goal of the Act to ensure that detention is the last resort and for as short of a time as possible. Makes other changes.
Title
JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 17a-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4543&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4543.htm |