IL HB4542 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the Electronic Registration Information Center shall provide the exclusive interstate voter registration program for the State. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall not share identification records contained in databases maintained by State agencies with any interstate voter registration program other than the Electronic Registration Information Center. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTION CD-ELECTRONIC REGISTR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4542&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4542.htm |