IL HB4541 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the definition of "financial institution" in the Finance Division of the Code includes any savings bank, savings and loan association, or credit union (rather than savings and loan associations and federally chartered commercial bank or savings and loan association) and regional planning commissions or joint regional planning commissions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0854
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 007-000-000
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-1-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback