IL HB4536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0853
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback