IL HB4534 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Commitment to Justice Act and includes legislative findings. Amends the Court of Claims Act. Removes the $100,000 limit on awards in tort cases. Provides that the changes apply to cases filed on or after July 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
COURT OF CLAIMS AWARD LIMITS
Sponsors
Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4534&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4534.htm |