IL HB4526 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that "day care homes" means family homes which receive more than 3 and up to a maximum of 14 children (instead of 12) for less than 24 hours per day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DAY CARE HOME CAPACITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-04HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-03-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2022-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-02-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2022-02-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2022-01-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-01-21HouseFirst Reading
2022-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225102.18Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback