IL HB4520 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that subject to the availability of local resources, beginning with the 2025-2026 school year, each public middle school, junior high school, and high school may establish a junior color guard program to promote the value of and honor military personnel. Provides that the junior color guard may be used at school events, including interscholastic athletic events and other events in which the presenting of the colors is requested. Provides that each school may allow the junior color guard to participate in community events in which the presenting of the colors may be requested. Provides that each school may work with a civic organization or association to provide adequate training to the members of the junior color guard on the execution of their duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-JUNIOR COLOR GUARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
2024-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
2024-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2024-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.87New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.85New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback