IL HB4516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to require coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals under the age of 18 when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument. Provides that an insurer shall provide coverage for hearing aids subject to certain restrictions. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim if the insured filed such a claim 12 months prior to the date of filing the claim with the insurer and the claim was paid by any insurer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD - HEARING AID COVERAGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1026
2018-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2018
2018-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000
2018-05-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-001
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 012-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.29New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4516&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4516.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4516eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4516enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1026.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4516ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4516sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4516_04262018_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4516_05232018_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4516sam001_05312018_047000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback