IL HB4516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to require coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals under the age of 18 when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument. Provides that an insurer shall provide coverage for hearing aids subject to certain restrictions. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim if the insured filed such a claim 12 months prior to the date of filing the claim with the insurer and the claim was paid by any insurer. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD - HEARING AID COVERAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1026 |
2018-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2018 |
2018-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-001 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |