IL HB4514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that only persons licensed and endorsed as a school counselor under the Code may use the title "school counselor".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH COUNSELOR-TITLE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2018-03-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.24aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback