IL HB4513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that for any project under a construction contract, the contract shall require that, to the extent practicable, at least 10% of man-hours performing construction services be performed by individuals who reside in areas of poverty. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to annually release a list of areas of poverty that meet the requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRO CD-CONSTRUCT MAN-HOURS REQ

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-047-001
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-001-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050030-40New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback