IL HB4512 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of streetgang member loitering. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she is a streetgang member or is in the company of or acting in concert with a streetgang member and knowingly loiters in a public place under any of the following circumstances: (1) with intent to publicize a criminal streetgang's dominance over certain territory in order to intimidate non-members of the streetgang from entering, remaining in, or using the public place or adjacent area; or (2) with the intent to conceal ongoing commerce in illegal drugs or other unlawful activity. Provides that nothing in this provision shall be construed in any way to limit the power or right of a law enforcement officer to make any investigation, detention, or arrest as the law enforcement officer would be permitted to make in absence of this provision. Provides that a streetgang member or a person in the company of or acting in concert with a streetgang member who violates this provision is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-STREETGANG LOITERING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-002-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-6.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback