IL HB4510 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that a person who willfully or maliciously tortures, mutilates, injures, disables, poisons, or kills any animal used by a law enforcement department or agency in the performance of the functions or duties of the department or agency of when placed off duty, any service animal, any search and rescue dog, any law enforcement, service, or search and rescue animal in training, or any accelerant detection canine used by a fire officer for arson investigations in the performance of his or her functions or while off duty, if the animal is not killed or totally disabled, the person is guilty of a Class 3 felony, and if the animal is killed or totally disabled, the person is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Provides that a person who kills or severely injures any animal used by a law enforcement department or agency in the performance of the functions or duties of the department or agency of when placed off duty, any service animal, any search and rescue dog, any law enforcement, service, or search and rescue animal in training, or any accelerant detection canine used by a fire officer for arson investigations in the performance of his or her functions or while off duty, while he or she is in the commission of a felony, is guilty of a Class 2 felony. If the offender is found to be guilty under this Section, the offender shall be responsible for any veterinarian bills for an animal that was injured, and training costs for another animal, if the animal injured or killed is no longer able to be in service. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-POLICE AND SERVICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-004-000
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510704.04Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback