IL HB4508 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Modifies the definition of "water or sewer utility" to remove language specifying water or sewer service provided to 7,500 or fewer customer connections as provided by certain entities. Provides that appraisals of the fair market value of the water or sewer utility that is being acquired shall be performed by 3 appraisers approved (rather than selected) by the Illinois Commerce Commission's Executive Director or designee (rather than the water department manager) and engaged by either the water or sewer utility being acquired or by the large public utility. Allows appraisers to engage one disinterested engineer who is licensed in this State who may be the same engineer that is engaged by other appraisers. Provides that in the Commission's order that approves the large public utility's acquisition of the water or sewer utility, the Commission shall issue its decision establishing, among other requirements, the rates to be charged to customers in the water or sewer utility. Provides that a large public utility may (rather than shall) recommend the district or tariff group of which the water or sewer utility shall become a part of after the acquisition, or may recommend a lesser rate for the water or sewer utility. Provides that from the date of acquisition until the date that new rates are effective in an acquiring large public utility's next rate case, the customers of the acquired water or sewer utility shall pay the approved then-existing rates of the district or tariff group as ordered by the Commission, or some lesser rates as recommended by the large public utility and approved by the Commission. Provides that in an acquiring large public utility's 2 rate cases following an acquisition, the public utility may file a rate tariff for an acquired water or sewer utility that establishes lesser rates than the district or tariff group into which the water or sewer utility is combined. Extends the repeal date of the valuation of water and sewer utilities Section from June 1, 2018 to June 1, 2028. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-WATER & SEWER VALUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-006-001
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-003-000
2018-05-09SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-09SenateRe-referred to Executive
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-02SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-19HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-037-002
2018-04-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-16HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-002-002
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-210.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback