IL HB4507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the fifth day of March of each year shall be designated as the Day of the Horse, to be observed throughout the State as a day to encourage citizens to honor and celebrate the role of equines in the history and character of Illinois, and to recognize the benefits of the equine industry to the economy, agriculture, tourism, and quality of life in Illinois.
Title
COMMEMORATIVE DATES-HORSE DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1032 |
2018-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2018 |
2018-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 097-007-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-007-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-001 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-001 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |