IL HB4506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Provides that stalking does not include an exercise of the right to free speech or assembly that is otherwise lawful or picketing that is otherwise lawful (rather than, "an exercise of the right to free speech or assembly that is otherwise lawful or picketing occurring at the workplace that is otherwise lawful and arises out of a bona fide labor dispute, including any controversy concerning wages, salaries, hours, working conditions or benefits, including health and welfare, sick leave, insurance, and pension or retirement provisions, the making or maintaining of collective bargaining agreements, and the terms to be included in those agreements"). Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits stalking when he or she knowingly engages in a course of conduct directed at a specific person, and he or she knows or should know that this course of conduct would cause a reasonable person to fear for his or her safety or the safety of a third person (rather than, in addition, to suffer other emotional distress). Provides that a person commits cyberstalking when he or she engages in a course of conduct using electronic communication directed at a specific person, and he or she knows or should know that would cause a reasonable person to fear for his or her safety (rather than, in addition, to suffer other emotional distress). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STALKING OFFENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-7.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7402110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback