IL HB4504 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Swimming Facility Act and Swimming Pool Safety Act. Provides that "swimming pool" does not include therapeutic pools used in physical therapy programs operated by medical facilities licensed by the Department of Public Health or operated by physical therapists licensed under the Illinois Physical Therapy Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SWIMMING POOLS-THERAPY POOLS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101253.01Amended CodeCitation Text
2101301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback