IL HB4502 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that all imitation handguns shall be sold from behind the counter, in an age restricted area, or in a sealed display case. Provides that a violation is a Class B misdemeanor. Defines "imitation handgun" as an air gun, air pistol, B-B gun, paint ball gun, pellet gun, or any other implement that is not a firearm but is designed to resemble and has the appearance of a handgun whether or not the implement is capable of firing any shot, bullet, or other missile.
Title
DISPLAY OF IMITATION FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-09 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24.8-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24.8-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24.8-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |